OR HB3007 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 165, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 165, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to small estates. Clarifies that execution of bargain and sale deed does not place personal representative of estate in chain of title to property conveyed, except under certain circumstances. Clarifies procedure for opening and examination of contents of safe deposit box of decedent.
Title
Relating to estates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 165, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |