OR HB3022 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that diagnostic services are compensable under workers' compensation law after industrial accident or occupational disease has been determined to be compensable and if diagnostic services are reasonable and necessary to identify nature or extent of medical condition that may be related to industrial accident or occupational disease. Makes various changes to workers' compensation laws of this state.] Specifies certain limitations. Provides that employer bears burden of proof in denial of coverage that otherwise compensable condition is no longer major contributing cause of need for treatment and disability of combined condition. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to workers' compensation; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Hayden, Wallan; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Sprenger. |
2019-05-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |