OR HB3197 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets uniform time for filing of estate tax return. Extends time for filing of estate tax return as applicable to estate owing no federal estate tax.] Applies to estates of decedents dying on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to due date of estate tax return; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-06-04 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |