OR HB3224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 446, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 446, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs district attorney of each county to, no later than December 1, 2020, develop and adopt policies relating to discovery, charging decisions, sentencing and program recommendations and other specified subjects, and to make policies available to public on website. Directs district attorney of each county to, no later than December 1, 2020, develop and adopt policies relating to discovery, charging decisions, and case disposition] sentencing and program recommendations and other specified subjects, and to make policies available to public on website. Requires review and readoption of policies every five years.
Title
Relating to district attorney policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 446, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 40; Nays, 19--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Knopp; Excused, 1--Hansell. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Carried over to 06-04 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-24 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2019-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 24--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Clem, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Nearman, Smith G. |
2019-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |