OR HB3353 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows nonprofit corporation that provides reduced-cost dental services to underserved populations, including individuals 55 years of age or older or individuals who require accessible facilities, to own, operate, conduct or maintain dental practice. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to dental services; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-18 | House | Informational Meeting held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3353 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3353/Introduced |