OR HB3384 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 416, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 416, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limits reasons counties may deny expansion of certain schools on land zoned for exclusive farm use. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to nonconforming schools in exclusive farm use zones; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 416, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Findley, Greenlick, Marsh. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Carried over to 05-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde, Nearman. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--McLain, Witt; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-03-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |