OR HB4005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 7, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 7, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires prescription drug manufacturer to report annually information to Department of Consumer and Business Services regarding prices of prescription drugs and costs associated with developing and marketing prescription drugs. Authorizes department to impose civil penalties on manufacturer for failing to comply with reporting requirements. Requires health insurers that offer prescription drug benefit to report to department specified information about prescription drug prices and impact of prescription drug prices on premium rates. Authorizes department to adopt by rule fees on manufacturers. Requires department to conduct annual public hearing on prescription drug prices and related information reported by manufacturers. Establishes Task Force on the Fair Pricing of Prescription Drugs. Specifies membership and duties. Requires task force to submit report to Legislative Assembly by November 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the price of prescription drugs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 7, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018. |
2018-03-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Linthicum declared potential conflict of interest. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward, Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Hansell; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 14--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Nearman, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson. |
2018-02-27 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |