OR HB4052 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 20, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 20, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Small Business Rules Advisory Committee to serve as advisory committee for agencies adopting new administrative rules and to review effectiveness of existing administrative rules. Requires agency to review effect of rule every five years.] Directs Secretary of State to compile reports on rules and to report annually to Legislative Assembly. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to administrative rules; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 20, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Baertschiger Jr declared potential conflict of interest. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2018-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |