OR HB4053 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 113, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 113, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Chief Education Office to prepare annual report on accelerated college credit programs. Sunsets report requirements on January 2, 2029. Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to develop statewide standards related to information provided by public post-secondary institutions of higher education about accelerated college credit programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to accelerated college credit programs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Chapter 113, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018. |
2018-04-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |