OR HB4059 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 93, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 93, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and adds laws related to transportation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transportation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Chapter 93, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018. |
2018-04-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-02 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Meek. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown, Vial. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 3--Buehler, Meek, Parrish; Excused for Business of the House, 12--Gomberg, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Rayfield, Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark, Whisnant, Williamson. |
2018-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |