OR HB4079 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definitions applicable for purposes of universal service surcharge. Subjects sale of retail commercial mobile radio services and retail interconnected voice over internet protocol services to universal service surcharge. Reduces rate cap to six percent of sale of services subject to surcharge. Directs Public Utility Commission to transfer up to $5 million per year of moneys deposited in universal service fund to Broadband Fund. Establishes Broadband Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in Broadband Fund to Oregon Business Development Department to provide grants and loans through, and to administer, program related to broadband. Directs department to adopt program for providing grants and loans by rule. Directs department to report annually to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to telecommunications on status of Broadband Fund. Sunsets Broadband Fund, transfer of moneys from universal service fund to Broadband Fund and grant program on January 2, 2030. Becomes operative on January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the universal service fund; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |