OR HB4092 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes standards for expansion of state airport on land zoned for exclusive farm use. Directs Oregon Homeland Security Council to prioritize state airports for resiliency investments.
Title
Relating to state airports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2018-02-15 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |