OR HB5035 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 454, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 454, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Department of State Lands for certain purposes. Limits certain biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain lottery funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of State Lands; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 454, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Carried over to 06-11 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 4--Barreto, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boles, Prusak, Speaker Kotek, Williamson. |
2019-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |