OR HCR202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors First Lieutenant Frederick E. Pokorney, Jr., for his service to his country.
Title
Recognizing and honoring First Lieutenant Frederick E. Pokorney, Jr., for his service to his country.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Girod, Kruse, Winters. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-12 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Olson. Adopted. Ayes, 60. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 12, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |