OR SB1042 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Governor to enter into agreement with another state for purpose of cross-jurisdictional coordination and enforcement of marijuana-related businesses. Specifies that under laws of other state, production, processing, sale and testing of marijuana items must be lawful. Specifies that borders of this state must abut borders of other state. Prohibits transporting marijuana items through use of navigable airspace, through use of any mode of transportation subject solely to federal regulation and through any state or territory of United States that is not party to agreement.
Title
Relating to cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |