OR SB107 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption, under certain circumstances, to natural gas utility vehicles when inspecting or repairing natural gas leak, and to electric utility vehicles when responding to emergency , from offense of illegal stopping, standing or parking. Provides exemption, under certain circumstances, to natural gas utility vehicles ,] when inspecting or repairing natural gas leak, and to electric utility vehicles when responding to emergency under certain circumstances], from offense of illegal stopping, standing or parking.
Title
Relating to exemptions to offense of illegal stopping, standing or parking.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 232, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Gorsek, Helm, Smith DB, Sprenger, Wilde. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |