OR SB109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain documents prepared by or for internal use of financial institutions are not real estate appraisal activity requiring preparer of document to carry real estate appraiser certification, license or registration. Provides that real estate appraisal activity does not include certain evaluations performed by state licensed appraiser or state certified appraiser if evaluation includes prescribed disclaimer.
Title
Relating to real estate appraisals.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 127, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Drazan. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | House | Carried over to May 2, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-04-30 | House | Carried over to May 1, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-04-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |