OR SB139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new requirements applicable to prior authorization, step therapy and other utilization review policies and procedures on insurers offering health benefit plans and health insurance, medical services contracts, multiple employer welfare arrangements, health care service contracts and pharmacy benefit managers. Imposes restrictions and reporting requirements for utilization management of health services by commercial insurers, coordinated care organizations and state medical assistance program.] Extends from 30 to 90 days period during which insurer's approval of prior authorization is binding on insurer. Authorizes provider to act on behalf of enrollee, upon request of enrollee, with respect to internal appeals and external reviews of adverse benefit determination concerning utilization review. Requires insurers offering health benefit plans to report specified information to Department of Consumer and Business Services regarding requests for prior authorization.
Title
Relating to managing the utilization of health services.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |