OR SB1501 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces minimum and maximum number of members for State Fair Council. Limits consecutive terms of service on council. Requires Governor to adjust terms of office for council members holding office on effective date of Act to achieve staggered expiration of member terms. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the State Fair Council; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Effective date, June 2, 2018. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 068, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Olson. |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2018-02-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley, Roblan. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |