OR SB1520 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands 90-day grace period for employment to all licensees who are licensed by Teacher Standards and Practices Commission. Allows commission to adopt expedited process for issuance of licenses. Removes moot references to institutions of higher education in public charter school law. Consolidates reporting requirements for Higher Education Coordinating Commission. Clarifies school district obligations related to offering of half-day kindergarten. Provides that Network of Quality Teaching and Learning is established within Chief Education Office. Extends by two years sunset on provisions that allow individuals who are foreign exchange students and who are residing in Oregon in dormitory operated by school district to be considered residents of school district in which dormitory is located. Extends by three years time by which educator preparation programs must comply with certain national organization accreditation requirements. Provides that moneys in National Board Certification Fund may be distributed only to persons who are licensed by commission and who are employed with public educational program. Removes sunset on provision that virtual public charter schools may contract with for-profit entity to provide educational services if employee is administrator and meets other requirements. Requires Department of Education to reallocate funds, or to seek additional funds, if insufficient funds are available to reimburse school districts for lunches provided free of charge to certain students.] Expands types of teaching and administrative licenses that may be held by persons participating in beginning teacher and administrator mentorship programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Effective date, April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 72, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Barnhart, Holvey; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard. |
2018-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Dembrow, Frederick, Riley; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |