OR SB1522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Effective date, March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Effective date, March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements imposed on school districts for persons receiving special education who have received modified diploma, funding for youths in Youth Corrections Education Program who have received modified diploma and eligibility for Expanded Options Program for students who have received modified diploma. Modifies requirements imposed on school districts for persons receiving special education who have received modified diploma, funding for youths in Youth Corrections Education Program who have received modified diploma and eligibility for Expanded Options Program for students who have received modified diploma. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to modified diplomas; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Effective date, March 16, 2018. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 039, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2018-02-28 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley, Roblan. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Carried over to 02-16 by unanimous consent. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |