OR SB1533 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows facility providing equine and equine-affiliated therapy or counseling to be established in area zoned for exclusive farm use if certain conditions are met. Allows facility providing equine and equine-affiliated therapy or counseling that incorporates activities utilizing nonclinical setting] to be established in area zoned for exclusive farm use if certain conditions are met.
Title
Relating to the siting of facilities that incorporate nonclinical treatment settings.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2019. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 119, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Olson. |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2018-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |