OR SB1563 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that students who are not citizens or lawful permanent residents apply for official federal identification document to be eligible for exemption from paying nonresident tuition at public universities. Permits public universities, Oregon Health and Science University and community colleges] Higher Education Coordinating Commission to provide scholarships and other financial aid to students who are not citizens or lawful permanent residents. Permits Oregon Health and Science University and community colleges] to exempt from paying nonresident tuition students who are not citizens or lawful permanent residents. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state benefits for undocumented individuals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Effective date, April 13, 2018. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 122, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2018-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow, President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |