OR SB176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain filling stations, service stations, garages and other dispensaries that dispense Class 1 flammable liquids to provide equal access to persons with disabilities.
Title
Relating to equal access to fuel dispensing services.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Environment and Natural Resources by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Environment and Natural Resources by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 237, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Mitchell. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Barker, Leif; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power. |
2019-05-22 | House | Carried over to May 23, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-04-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Olsen. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Carried over to 04-01 by unanimous consent. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources by prior reference. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Environment and Natural Resources by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |