OR SB249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies requirements for insurer determinations regarding requests for prior authorization for coverage of health care items, services, procedures and settings.
Title
Relating to prior authorization determinations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 284, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Greenlick. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Riley. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |