OR SB355 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes nonsubstantive and technical changes in Oregon law. Corrects grammar and punctuation. Deletes obsolete provisions. Conforms language to existing statutes and legislative style.
Title
Relating to correction of erroneous material in Oregon law.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 13, 2019 Laws. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--McLain, McLane, Witt. |
2019-03-19 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Olsen; Excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |