OR SB36 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws relating to home and farm loans for veterans. Defines certain terms for purposes of home and farm loans for veterans. Removes improvements from permissible uses of home and farm loans for veterans.
Title
Relating to veteran loans.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 223, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 54; Absent, 1--Helm; Excused, 2--Barker, Leif; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Boshart Davis, Power, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-22 | House | Carried over to May 23, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-11 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |