OR SB370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, June 6, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, June 6, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employer to provide notice to employees of upcoming inspection by federal agency of employer's records regarding identity and employment eligibility of employees within three business days of employer's receipt of notice of inspection from agency. Requires employer to provide notice to employees of upcoming inspection by federal agency of employer's records regarding identity and employment eligibility of employees within 72 hours] three business days of employer's receipt of notice of inspection from agency. Establishes requirements for posting notice] notifying employees of upcoming inspection and information that must be included in notice. Requires Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to generate and make available on Bureau of Labor and Industries website template for employers to use to comply with notice requirements and provide consultation, technical assistance and training to employers]. Requires that commissioner make template available in certain languages. Allows employer to refuse to consent to entry by federal agency absent judicial warrant.] Authorizes commissioner to adopt rules necessary to implement requirements of Act.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to federal inspections of records that employers use to verify the employment eligibility of an employee; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, June 6, 2019. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 260, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 13--Bonham, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 7--Barreto, Gorsek, Hernandez, Nearman, Noble, Smith Warner, Sprenger. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Carried over to May 23, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-04-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Fagan, Gelser, Johnson. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |