OR SB390 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows farm direct marketer sales and consignment sales of olive oil. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the sale of olive oil; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Boquist [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Agriculture and Land Use (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Agriculture and Land Use (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 249, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Meek; Excused, 5--Gorsek, Helm, Smith DB, Sprenger, Wilde. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-18 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |