OR SB451 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes eligibility for renewable energy certificates for facilities that generate electricity from direct combustion of municipal solid waste and became operational before January 1, 1995, if such facilities register with Western Renewable Energy Generation Information System at any time, and for up to 11 average megawatts of electricity generated, per calendar year, from the combustion of biogenic material. Establishes eligibility for renewable energy certificates for facilities that generate electricity from direct combustion of municipal solid waste and became operational before January 1, 1995, if such facilities register with Western Renewable Energy Generation Information System at any time, and for up to 11 average megawatts of electricity generated, per calendar year, from the combustion of biogenic material.
Title
Relating to eligibility for renewable energy certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-06-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 11--Boquist, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Manning Jr, Prozanski, Riley, Taylor, Thomsen, Wagner. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Environment and Natural Resources by order of the President. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Carbon Reduction. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |