OR SB484 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits landlord to single applicant screening charge per 60-day period, per applicant applying to rent multiple dwelling units owned or managed by landlord. Limits landlord to single applicant screening charge per 60-day period, per applicant applying to rent multiple dwelling units owned or managed by landlord. Requires landlord to refund applicant screening charge if applicant qualifies but is not offered dwelling unit to rent.].
Title
Relating to applicant screening charges for residential tenancies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 251, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Findley, Greenlick, Hayden, Keny-Guyer, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-03-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; Excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |