OR SB5514 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date, July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Commission on Judicial Fitness and Disability for biennial expenses. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Commission on Judicial Fitness and Disability; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2019. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 26, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 4--Bynum, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Piluso. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 1, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-27 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, President Courtney, Thomsen. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |