OR SB591 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes violation of statutes or rules regarding minimum standards for wine, or branding or labeling requirements for wine, unlawful trade practice.
Title
Relating to unlawful trade practices regarding wine.
Sponsors
Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Jackie Winters [R] |
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |