OR SB637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Raises statutory threshold for requiring public utility to receive Public Utility Commission approval for disposition of certain property from $100,000 to $1 million. Requires public utility to submit annual report to commission summarizing transactions for disposition of property valued in excess of $25,000 but less than $1 million. Repeals requirement that public utility notify commission of disposition of certain property valued in excess of $25,000 but less than $100,000. Requires public utility to determine value of property for purposes of compliance with statutory thresholds based on portion of value of property recognized as basis of operating expense or capital expenditure in Oregon rate valuation or other hearing or proceeding.
Title
Relating to disposition of utility property.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 252, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Drazan; Excused, 5--Gorsek, Helm, Smith DB, Sprenger, Wilde. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-03-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Hass, Heard, President Courtney, Wagner. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |