OR SB643 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Effective date, June 27, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Effective date, June 27, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates cap on total amount authorized for grant program for installation of generator connectors on fuel sources at cardlock fuel facilities. Increases maximum amount authorized for each grant. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to fuel storage facility compatibility grant program; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Effective date, June 27, 2019. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 516, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Leif. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-06-17 | House | Carried over to June 18, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |