OR SB723 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits person from conducting or participating in contest, competition, tournament or derby that has objective of taking coyotes for prizes . Prohibits person from conducting or participating in contest, competition, tournament or derby that has objective of taking coyotes for prizes or other inducement]. Punishes violation of prohibition by maximum fine of $2,000. Provides that person that injures or kills coyote in violation of Act forfeits remains of coyote to State Department of Fish and Wildlife. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unlawful takings of wildlife; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-06-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-06-12HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-06-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Thomsen.
2019-06-05SenateMotion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner.
2019-06-04SenateCarried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-03SenateCarried over to 06-04 by unanimous consent.
2019-05-30SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-29SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed B-Eng. Minority)
2019-05-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) Baertschiger Jr, Boquist not concurring.
2019-05-20SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-04-26SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2019-04-26SenateRecommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-04SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-01-29SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB723
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB723/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB723/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB723/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB723/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB723/Senate%20Minority%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB723/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB723/Minority%20Report%20to%20B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28636
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29584
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=472073
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=472089

Bill Comments

feedback