OR SB772 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Forest Health Enhancement to develop recommendations for certain forest-related activities. Establishes Task Force on Forest Health Enhancement to design program for carrying out] develop recommendations for certain forest-related activities. Requires task force to make every effort to report recommendations to interim] committee of Legislative Assembly related to natural resources no later than September 15, 2020] by date of convening of 2020 regular session of Legislative Assembly, or as soon as possible. Sunsets task force December 31, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to a task force on forest health enhancement; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |