OR SB792 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws related to auto dismantler certificates.
Title
Relating to auto dismantlers.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Rep. Barbara Warner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 630, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Heard, Knopp, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |