OR SB829 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-11)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-11)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that, to extent provided by Oregon Liquor Control Commission rules, if appellation of origin on wine label is American viticultural area in Oregon that is in larger American viticultural area, label must also identify larger American viticultural area. Requires commission to make requirement applicable by rule within Willamette Valley viticultural area. Prohibits use of American viticultural area on wine label in manner resembling brand. Creates exception. Applies to wine labeled on or after January 1, 2023. Requires commission to appoint advisory committee. Sunsets advisory committee January 2, 2024. Requires commission to adopt rules establishing penalty schedule for labeling requirement. Requires adoption of initial rules in time to take effect January 1, 2023. Repeals rule adoption requirement January 2, 2024. Requires commission to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020, regarding advisory committee recommendations and status of commission rule adoption proceedings. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to wine labeling; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 425, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Hansell. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Hayden, Leif, McLane, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Economic Development. |
2019-04-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Golden, Heard, Linthicum. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |