PA HB1005 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 27, 2014 (P.L.2911, No.191), known as the Achieving Better Care by Monitoring All Prescriptions Program (ABC-MAP) Act, further providing for purpose, for definitions, for powers and duties of board and for establishment of program; providing for requirements for first responder agencies and hospital emergency departments; and further providing for access to prescription information.
Title
Further providing for purpose, for definitions, for powers and duties of board and for establishment of program; providing for requirements for first responder agencies and hospital emergency departments; and further providing for access to prescription information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1005 PN 2238, FP (Y: 110 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1005 PN 2022, 2019 A2397, COX (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1005 PN 2022, 2019 A2397, SUSP RULES, COX (Y: 192 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1005 PN 1341, 2019 A1645, HEFFLEY (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Health: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1005 PN 2022, 2019 A2397, COX (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1005 PN 2022, 2019 A2397, SUSP RULES, COX (Y: 192 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1005 PN 1341, 2019 A1645, HEFFLEY (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Health: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-24 | House | Final passage (110-89) |
2019-06-24 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-14 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to HEALTH |