PA HB102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for eligibility for license.
Title
In hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for eligibility for license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 102 PN 101, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 102 PN 101, FP (Y: 143 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 102 PN 101, FP (Y: 143 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Act No. 27 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (143-46) |
2019-05-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-14 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-01 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |