PA HB1021 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in matters affecting government units, providing for special standing in constitutional challenges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In matters affecting government units, providing for special standing in constitutional challenges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1021 PN 1631, FP (Y: 112 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1021 PN 1631, 2019 A989, ZABEL (Y: 87 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00809 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-05-07SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (112-85)
2019-05-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-06HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-01HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-30HouseReported as amended
2019-04-02HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1021
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1021&pn=1170
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1021&pn=1631
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=398
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=399
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=278
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/07/2019&RollCallId=459

Bill Comments

feedback