PA HB103 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 99 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 99 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of assault of law enforcement officer, for the offense of assault by prisoner and for the offense of assault by life prisoner; and, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for second and subsequent offenses and for sentences for offenses committed against law enforcement officer.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of assault of law enforcement officer, for the offense of assault by prisoner and for the offense of assault by life prisoner; and, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for second and subsequent offenses and for sentences for offenses committed against law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, CONCURRENCE (Y: 164 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5840, Motion to Table HAYWOOD Amendment No. A-5840 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5784, Motion to Table KEARNEY Amendment No. A-5784 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5737, Motion to Table SANTARSIERO Amendment No. A-5737 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05476 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 73, FP (Y: 146 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A436, SUSP RULES, KENYATTA (Y: 89 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A355, SHUSTERMAN (Y: 89 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A353, BRIGGS (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00169 (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, CONCURRENCE (Y: 164 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5840, Motion to Table HAYWOOD Amendment No. A-5840 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5784, Motion to Table KEARNEY Amendment No. A-5784 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 103 PN 3500, 2021 A5737, Motion to Table SANTARSIERO Amendment No. A-5737 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05476 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 73, FP (Y: 146 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A436, SUSP RULES, KENYATTA (Y: 89 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A355, SHUSTERMAN (Y: 89 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 103 PN 73, 2021 A353, BRIGGS (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00169 (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | House | Act No. 99 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (164-35) |
2022-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-10-25 | House | In the House |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-6) |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-03-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (146-56) |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-15 | House | Second consideration |
2021-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-01-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-01-27 | House | First consideration |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |