PA HB1034 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in consolidated county assessment, further providing for definitions, for changes in assessed valuation and for abstracts of building and demolition permits to be forwarded to the county assessment office.
Title
In consolidated county assessment, further providing for definitions, for changes in assessed valuation and for abstracts of building and demolition permits to be forwarded to the county assessment office.
Sponsors
Rep. Garth Everett [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1034 PN 1206, FP (Y: 196 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1034 PN 1206, FP (Y: 196 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-4) |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |