PA HB1035 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 27, 1979 (P.L.241, No.78), entitled "An act authorizing political subdivisions, municipality authorities and transportation authorities to enter into contracts for the purchase of goods and the sale of real and personal property where no bids are received," further providing for title of the act; adding a short title; and providing for contracts for services.
Title
Amending the act of October 27, 1979 (P.L.241, No.78), entitled "An act authorizing political subdivisions, municipality authorities and transportation authorities to enter into contracts for the purchase of goods and the sale of real and personal property where no bids are received," further providing for title of the act; adding a short title; and providing for contracts for services.
Sponsors
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] |
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Steven Malagari [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Tina Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1035 PN 1207, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1035 PN 1207, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |