PA HB1036 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in creation and alteration, further providing for definitions and for judicial adjustment; in elections of officers, further providing for decrease in number of members of council; and, in manufacture and supply of electricity, further providing for specific powers.
Title
In creation and alteration, further providing for definitions and for judicial adjustment; in elections of officers, further providing for decrease in number of members of council; and, in manufacture and supply of electricity, further providing for specific powers.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1036 PN 3856, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1036 PN 3856, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1036 PN 1208, A5952, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-5952 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1036 PN 1208, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1036 PN 3856, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1036 PN 1208, A5952, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-5952 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1036 PN 1208, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | House | Act No. 28 |
2020-06-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Signed in House |
2020-05-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (180-22) |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-05-27 | House | In the House |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (40-10) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (29-21) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |