PA HB1048 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 66 over the Kiskiminetas River, Leechburg Borough, Armstrong County, as the Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 66 over the Kiskiminetas River, Leechburg Borough, Armstrong County, as the Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - House - HB 1048 PN 1262, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2013-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2013-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2013-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |