PA HB1048 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations for liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for issuance, transfer or extension of hotel, restaurant and club liquor licenses, for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for wine expanded permits, for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt and brewed beverages retail licenses, for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales and for renewal of licenses and temporary provisions for licensees in armed service.
Title
In licenses and regulations for liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for issuance, transfer or extension of hotel, restaurant and club liquor licenses, for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for wine expanded permits, for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt and brewed beverages retail licenses, for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales and for renewal of licenses and temporary provisions for licensees in armed service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1048 PN 3863, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1048 PN 3863, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1048 PN 3721, A5958, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-5958 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1048 PN 1211, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1048 PN 1211, 2019 A1546, BURNS (Y: 14 N: 185 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-09-19 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1048 PN 3863, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1048 PN 3863, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1048 PN 3721, A5958, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-5958 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1048 PN 1211, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1048 PN 1211, 2019 A1546, BURNS (Y: 14 N: 185 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-09-19 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | House | Act No. 29 |
2020-06-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Signed in House |
2020-05-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (202-0) |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-05-27 | House | In the House |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (34-16) |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-05-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2019-10-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-10-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-25 | House | Second consideration |
2019-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |