PA HB1049 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for homicide by vehicle and for homicide by vehicle while driving under influence.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for homicide by vehicle and for homicide by vehicle while driving under influence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1049 PN 1819, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1049 PN 1221, 2017 A1391, FARRY (Y: 166 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1049 PN 1221, 2017 A1371, FARRY (Y: 164 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1049 PN 1819, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1049 PN 1221, 2017 A1391, FARRY (Y: 166 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1049 PN 1221, 2017 A1371, FARRY (Y: 164 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-1) |
2017-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-05-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |