PA HB1050 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 15, 1982 (P.L.1266, No.287), entitled "An act conferring limited residency status on military personnel, their dependents and civilian personnel assigned to an active duty station in Pennsylvania," further providing for residency of students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of December 15, 1982 (P.L.1266, No.287), entitled "An act conferring limited residency status on military personnel, their dependents and civilian personnel assigned to an active duty station in Pennsylvania," further providing for residency of students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1050 PN 1779, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01241 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A01241 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-06-03SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2019-06-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-15HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-14HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-08HouseReported as amended
2019-04-05HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1050
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1050&pn=1213
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1050&pn=1779
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/08/2019&RollCallId=475
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/08/2019&RollCallId=474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=339
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/03/2019&RollCallId=582

Bill Comments

feedback